Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaume Traserra Cunillera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1934Born
19 Mar 195924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199358.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
9 Jun 199358.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selemselae
5 Sep 199359.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selemselae
28 Jul 200167.0AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
3 Nov 201076.3RetiredBishop of Solsona, Spain
25 Jan 201984.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaume Traserra Cunillera
Bishop Jaume Traserra Cunillera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranollers, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceGranollers, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Buried Place (Original)Sant Esteve, Church, Granollers, Archdiocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,131
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast