Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Salvatore Cardinal Nobili Vitelleschi

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1818Born
27 Mar 184122.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 185637.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
6 Jul 185637.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
8 Jun 185839.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
21 Dec 186345.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
25 Aug 187153.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
20 Nov 187153.3ResignedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
24 Nov 187153.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
15 Mar 187556.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 187557.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 187557.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
17 Oct 187557.2DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Nobili Vitelleschi
Salvatore Cardinal Nobili Vitelleschi (born , died ) Secretary of Bishops and Regulars

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134, and Page 511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 21
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017