Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis Buttigieg

Deceased

Bishop of Gozo, Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1793Born
21 Dec 181623.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186369.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
16 Mar 186369.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
3 May 186369.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
22 Sep 186470.8AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
23 Oct 186470.9InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
12 Jul 186672.6DiedBishop of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Buttigieg
Bishop Michael Francis Buttigieg (born , died ) Bishop of Gozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNadur, Diocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceGozo, Diocese of Gozo

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1863, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast