Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Niemiec

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Decoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1958Born
20 Dec 198628.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
24 Jun 198729.2Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Oct 200648.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
21 Oct 200648.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Decoriana
8 Dec 200648.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Decoriana
27 Oct 202062.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Niemiec (VIAF: 166984926)
Bishop Jan Niemiec (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKozłówek, Poland
Ordained BishopSts. Pierre et Paul, Cathedral, Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi
Death PlaceHospital, Łańcut, Archdiocese of Przemyśl, Poland

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,292
  • bp/od: CB, 6 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast