Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Martin Ngaviliau, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zanzibar, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1917Born
2 Apr 194932.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Jan 197355.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zanzibar, Tanzania
28 Mar 198063.0AppointedBishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania
5 Jun 198063.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania
30 Nov 199679.7RetiredBishop of Zanzibar, Tanzania
26 Jun 200588.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Zanzibar, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Bernard Martin Ngaviliau
Bishop Bernard Martin Ngaviliau C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zanzibar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarangu

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Vatican Information Service, 2 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast