Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Vincent Durning, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arusha, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1923Born
3 Jun 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1 Mar 196339.7AppointedBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
28 May 196340.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
6 Mar 198965.8ResignedBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
21 Feb 200278.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Arusha, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Dennis Vincent Durning
Bishop Dennis Vincent Durning C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arusha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGermantown, PA, USA

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast