Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Gaillard de Longjumeau

Deceased

Bishop of Apt, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1634Born
3 Jun 166228.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 167035.6SelectedBishop of Apt, France
20 Apr 167136.9ConfirmedBishop of Apt, France
28 Jun 167137.1Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
10 Feb 169560.7DiedBishop of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Gaillard de Longjumeau
Bishop Jean de Gaillard de Longjumeau (born , died ) Bishop of Apt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranville

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast