Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oita

Dioecesis Oitaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Sueo Hamaguchi, Bishop
  • Peter Takaaki Hirayama, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 22 December 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nagasaki
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 14,072 (5,435 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 3-7-30 Chuo-Machi, Oita-shi, Oita-ken 870-0035, Japan
  • Telephone: (097)532-3397
  • Fax: 538-6287

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Miyazaki
27 March 1927ErectedDiocese of Fukuoka Mission "Sui Iuris" of Miyazaki (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Miyazaki
28 January 1935ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Miyazaki Prefecture Apostolic of Miyazaki
Diocese of Oita
22 December 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Miyazaki Diocese of Oita

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Miyazaki
19502,9503,000,000.1%1222312822458ap1951
Diocese of Oita
19696,0552,234,804.3%544491235515121ap1971
19805,7502,366,070.2%65258996021227ap1981
19885,4522,424,301.2%75562877223043ap1991
19995,8922,404,645.2%115061966925727ap2000
20005,9312,402,071.2%5254106557625027ap2001
20015,9542,399,655.2%946551086426327ap2002
20025,9392,387,965.2%941501186126626ap2003
20035,8162,386,818.2%1146571026625127ap2004
20045,7642,368,659.2%114758996523826ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Dec 2014