Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Bertin Nadonye Ndongo, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Lolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1965 BornBotuzu
17 Sep 198924.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Sep 199227.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Aug 199328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jan 201549.8AppointedBishop of Lolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Apr 201550.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Bertin Nadonye Ndongo:
Bishop Jean-Bertin Nadonye Ndongo O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Lolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Feb 2015
  • c34: CB, 17 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,472

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015