Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fridolin Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap.

Coadjutor Archbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Apostolic Administrator of Bokungu-Ikela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1960 Born
1981²20.9First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Aug 198828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Nov 200444.8AppointedBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Mar 200545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Oct 200848.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Aug 201555.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
5 Mar 201656.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Nov 201656.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Nov 201656.8AppointedArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Dec 201656.8InstalledArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Feb 201858.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fridolin Ambongo Besungu
Archbishop Fridolin Ambongo Besungu O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoto, Diocese of Molegbe
Ordained BishopOpen Air in Front of, Cathedral, Bokungu, Diocese of Bokungu-Ikela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,829
  • ab: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2016
  • i: CB, 10 Dec 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast