Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Maemba Liwoke

Bishop Emeritus of Lolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1937 BornGamangwa
15 Aug 196932.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 198345.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Mar 198345.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
10 Jul 198346.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
28 Aug 198750.3AppointedBishop of Lolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jan 201577.8RetiredBishop of Lolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Maemba Liwoke:
Bishop Ferdinand Maemba Liwoke (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2015
  • by: CB, 29 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015