Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sarkis Davidian, I.C.P.B.

Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1943 BornAleppo, Syria
11 Oct 197026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
1 Oct 201571.8AppointedBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran
21 Nov 201572.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian), Iran

MicroData Summary for Sarkis Davidian:
Bishop Sarkis Davidian I.C.P.B. (born ) Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Ispahan {Esfáan) (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Nov 2015
  • c3+: CB, 21 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015