Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anatole Milandou

Archbishop of Brazzaville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1946 BornNsamouna
23 Jun 197428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brazzaville, Congo
22 Jul 198337.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazzaville, Congo
22 Jul 198337.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capra
28 Aug 198337.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capra
3 Oct 198741.5AppointedBishop of Kinkala, Congo
23 Jan 200154.8AppointedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Anatole Milandou:
Archbishop Anatole Milandou (born ) Archbishop of Brazzaville

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brazzaville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013