Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juventino Kestering

Deceased

Bishop of Rondonópolis - Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1946Born
14 Jul 197327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Nov 199751.5AppointedBishop of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
8 Mar 199851.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Jun 201468.0AppointedBishop of Rondonópolis - Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Mar 202174.8DiedBishop of Rondonópolis - Guiratinga, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Juventino Kestering
Bishop Juventino Kestering (born , died ) Bishop of Rondonópolis - Guiratinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Ludgero
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tubarão, Diocese of Tubarão, Santa Catarina
Death PlaceUnimed, Hospital, Rondonópolis, Diocese of Rondonópolis - Guiratinga, Mato Grosso

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,247
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2014
  • d: CB, 28 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Mar 2021

Quantcast