Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale Lupi

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1856Born
20 Sep 187923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ferrara, Italy
14 Jul 190650.2AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
23 Sep 190650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
14 May 190852.1DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale Lupi
Bishop Annibale Lupi (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgo San Giorgio

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast