Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Olivares, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1873Born
4 Apr 189622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
15 Nov 190532.0IncardinatedPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jul 191642.7AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
29 Oct 191643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
19 May 194369.5DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Olivares
Bishop Luigi Olivares S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorbetta

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018