Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Moore, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bauchi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1942Born
20 Dec 196523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
5 Jul 199654.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bauchi, Nigeria
5 Jul 199654.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
7 Nov 199654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi
31 Dec 200361.9AppointedBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria
20 Jan 201068.0DiedBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Francis Moore (VIAF: 1976548)
Bishop John Francis Moore S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Bauchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,865
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast