Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Minj

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Simdega, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1932Born
10 Jul 196027.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 199360.6AppointedBishop of Simdega, India
24 Aug 199360.8Ordained BishopBishop of Simdega, India
11 Feb 200875.3RetiredBishop of Simdega, India
16 Aug 201885.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Simdega, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Minj
Bishop Joseph Minj (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Simdega

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaikpara-Dholkobera
Ordained BishopOpen Air near, Ste-Anne, Church, Simdega, Diocese of Simdega
Death PlaceShanti Bhawan Medical Centre Biru, Simdega, Diocese of Simdega

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,167
  • d: CB, 16 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Aug 2018

Quantcast