Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bongianino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1919Born
19 Sep 194222.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 196848.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alba (Pompea), Italy
2 Feb 196848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturia
24 Mar 196848.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturia
15 Jan 197050.1AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
6 Jun 197555.5AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
2 Feb 199676.2RetiredBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Oct 200383.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bongianino
Bishop Luigi Bongianino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgo d'Ale

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast