Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Pierre Leonard, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1889Born
8 Dec 192131.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Jan 193646.0AppointedBishop of Trichinopoly, India
15 Mar 193646.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trichinopoly, India
8 Jan 193848.0AppointedBishop of Madura, India
19 Sep 195363.7AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
13 Apr 196777.2RetiredArchbishop of Madurai, India
13 Apr 196777.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Izirzada
25 Jul 197686.5ResignedTitular Archbishop of Izirzada
5 Dec 198595.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India

MicroData Summary for Jean Pierre Leonard
Archbishop Jean Pierre Leonard S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDudelange, Luxembourg

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast