Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Mels, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1908BornLokeren
15 Aug 193324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Mar 194940.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luluabourg, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Mar 194940.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
17 May 194940.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
10 Nov 195951.0AppointedArchbishop of Luluabourg, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Sep 196758.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Oct 197061.8ResignedBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Oct 197061.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pulcheriopolis
17 May 198677.5ResignedTitular Archbishop of Pulcheriopolis
1 Nov 199283.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Bernard Mels:
Archbishop Bernard Mels C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luiza

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013