Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Toussaint, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1920Born
8 Jul 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Jan 195837.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Jan 195837.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
11 May 195838.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
10 Nov 195939.6AppointedBishop of Ipamu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 May 197050.2ResignedBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 May 197050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
23 Jul 197656.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
21 Mar 199373.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for René Toussaint
Bishop René Toussaint O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOchamps, Belgium

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018