Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Magner

Deceased

Bishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1887Born
17 May 191326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Dec 194053.7AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
24 Feb 194153.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
13 Jun 194760.2DiedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Magner
Bishop Francis Joseph Magner (born , died ) Bishop of Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilmington, IL

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast