Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Peter McManaman

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Floriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1900Born
12 Mar 192726.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 194848.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jul 194848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Floriana
28 Oct 194848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Floriana
18 Jul 196464.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Peter McManaman
Bishop Edward Peter McManaman (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Erie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilkes-Barre, PA

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast