Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony De Palma, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of De Aar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1913BornWalton, NY, USA
20 May 194430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
15 Jul 195945.9AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
13 Apr 196753.6AppointedBishop of De Aar, South Africa
6 Jun 196753.8ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
19 Jul 196753.9Ordained BishopBishop of De Aar, South Africa
18 Nov 198774.2RetiredBishop of De Aar, South Africa
3 Feb 200591.4DiedBishop Emeritus of De Aar, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony De Palma:
Bishop Joseph Anthony De Palma S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of De Aar

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013