Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Murphy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1909BornBelmullet
3 Jun 193424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
6 May 197262.7AppointedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
28 Aug 197263.0Ordained BishopBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
21 Mar 198676.6RetiredBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
18 Sep 199788.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Murphy:
Bishop John Patrick Murphy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015