Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Kambale Mbogha, A.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bukavu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1942BornKilubo
24 Jul 196926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
197229.2ProfessedPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
11 Jun 199047.6AppointedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Nov 199048.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Dec 199553.1AppointedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Mar 200158.4AppointedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Oct 200562.9DiedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Charles Kambale Mbogha:
Archbishop Charles Kambale Mbogha A.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bukavu

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,292
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013