Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Matos Pereira, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1918Born
18 Sep 194527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
25 Apr 197355.3AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Jun 197355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Aug 197658.5DiedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Matos Pereira
Bishop José de Matos Pereira C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Barretos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaiúva
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Rainha dos Apóstolos, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast