Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Simon Chibuga Masondole

Bishop-Elect of Bunda, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1972 Born
25 Jan 200633.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mwanza, Tanzania
2 Jul 200633.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mwanza, Tanzania
27 Nov 201038.1IncardinatedPriest of Bunda, Tanzania
6 Apr 202148.5AppointedBishop of Bunda, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Simon Chibuga Masondole
Father Simon Chibuga Masondole (born ) Bishop-Elect of Bunda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukiko, Ukerewe District, Diocese of Mwanza
Ordained DeaconSt. Karoli Lwanga Major, Seminary, Segerea, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
Ordained PriestNyamanga, Church, Ukerewe, Archdiocese of Mwanza

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Bunda.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2021
  • bp/inca: CB, 6 Apr 2021
  • loc: CB, 15 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast