Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guadalupe Torres Campos

Bishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1960 BornLeón
2 Jul 198424.4Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
3 Jan 200443.9IncardinatedPriest of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México
10 Dec 200545.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
10 Dec 200545.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
22 Feb 200646.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza
25 Nov 200848.8AppointedBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México
17 Feb 200949.0InstalledBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México
20 Dec 201454.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe Torres Campos:
Bishop José Guadalupe Torres Campos (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Juárez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Juárez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,068
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014