Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldomero Carlos Martini

Bishop Emeritus of San Justo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1939 BornPorteña
7 Sep 196929.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, Argentina
2 Dec 198849.1AppointedBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
5 Feb 198949.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
5 Mar 198949.4InstalledBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
14 Feb 200464.3AppointedBishop of San Justo, Argentina
6 Nov 201475.1RetiredBishop of San Justo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Baldomero Carlos Martini:
Bishop Baldomero Carlos Martini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Justo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Justo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,175
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014