Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Gourtay, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1874Born
28 Oct 190026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Jan 193358.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
10 Jan 193358.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
25 Mar 193358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
25 Sep 193359.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles
16 Sep 194470.3DiedVicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Gourtay
Bishop Pierre-Marie Gourtay C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of French Guiana-Cayenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteaulin, France

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018