Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri-Marie-François Varin de la Brunelière, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1900Born
12 Jul 192524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
28 Oct 192524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Oct 194140.8AppointedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
21 Jan 194241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
26 Sep 196766.7AppointedArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
4 Jul 197271.5RetiredArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
24 Jul 198382.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-François Varin de la Brunelière (VIAF: 190787582)
Archbishop Henri-Marie-François Varin de la Brunelière C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNotre-Dame-de-Cenilly, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fort-de-France, Diocese of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)
Death PlaceLa Régale, Rivière-Pilote, Archdiocese of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 5
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 343, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 553, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast