Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César-Joseph Marpot (Marport)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Claude, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1827Born
17 Dec 185326.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 188052.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
27 Feb 188052.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
18 Apr 188052.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
7 Jan 189870.1DiedBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for César-Joseph Marpot (Marport) (VIAF: 56603805)
Bishop César-Joseph Marpot (Marport) (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Agnès
Ordained BishopArbois

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017