Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antuvan Marovitch

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

Titular Bishop of Igilgili


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1926Born
17 Dec 195529.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Constantinople, Turkey
29 Jun 195629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Constantinople, Turkey
30 Oct 198659.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
30 Oct 198659.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Igilgili
18 Jan 198760.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Igilgili
29 May 198962.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
15 Dec 199165.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Antuvan Marovitch
Bishop Antuvan Marovitch (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIstanbul
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopS. Esprit, Cathedral, Istanbul, Vicariate Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,408
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast