Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Charles Dunne

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York

Titular Bishop of Abercornia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1937 BornBrooklyn
1 Jun 196325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
21 Oct 198850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
21 Oct 198850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abercornia
13 Dec 198851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abercornia
22 Jun 201375.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Charles Dunne:
Bishop John Charles Dunne (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,925
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015