Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Margiotta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1889Born
4 Aug 191222.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193546.0AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
3 May 193646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
25 Sep 195363.7AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
24 May 197585.4RetiredArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
8 Mar 197686.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Margiotta
Archbishop Nicola Margiotta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartina Franca

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast