Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentino Ferrer Cinense

Bishop Emeritus of Tarlac


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1938 BornGuimba
21 Dec 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 198446.1AppointedBishop of San Jose, Philippines
14 Jul 198446.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Jose, Philippines
17 Aug 198547.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarlac, Philippines
21 Jan 198849.8SucceededBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
31 Mar 201678.0RetiredBishop of Tarlac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Florentino Ferrer Cinense
Bishop Florentino Ferrer Cinense (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarlac

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarlac.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 31 Mar 2016