Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Maher

Deceased

Bishop of Port Augusta, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1840Born
1868²27.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 189655.4AppointedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
26 Apr 189655.7Ordained BishopBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
20 Dec 190565.4DiedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Maher
Bishop James Maher (born , died ) Bishop of Port Augusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrangemockler, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Adelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,661
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017