Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Bernard Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Geraldton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1855Born
24 Jun 188328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
189438.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
21 Mar 189843.2AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
14 Aug 189843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
190953.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
26 Dec 192166.9DiedBishop of Geraldton, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Bernard Kelly
Bishop William Bernard Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Geraldton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYork, Western-Colony
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Adelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,663
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018