Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Magnati

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1644³Born
26 Jul 166823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jul 166823.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172782.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
8 Jun 172782.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
26 Aug 172984.9DiedTitular Bishop of Megara

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Magnati (VIAF: 54489326)
Bishop Vincenzo Magnati (born Sep 1644, died ) Titular Bishop of Megara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerreto, Diocese of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Popolo agli Incurabili, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Succurre Miseris ai Vergini, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 263
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 56
  • b/c2+: AT, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast