Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Invitti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1667BornNapoli
30 Nov 169124.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 169124.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 172457.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
7 Jan 172557.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
5 Sep 172558.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes

MicroData Summary for Domenico Invitti:
Archbishop Domenico Invitti (born ) Titular Archbishop of Sardes

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212, and Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015