Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolino Sandulli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1661³BornNapoli
14 Jan 168524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Mar 172766.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
25 Mar 172766.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolino Sandulli:
Bishop Paolino Sandulli O.S.B. (born ) Titular Bishop of Castoria

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • ob/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015