Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Philip Paroni, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1755¹Born
26 Jun 181863.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
26 Jun 181863.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
5 Jul 181863.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
29 Mar 184287.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Philip Paroni
Bishop Giovanni Philip Paroni O.F.M. Conv. (born 1755, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016