Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eleonoro Aronne

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1799Born
22 Dec 182122.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184243.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
22 Jul 184243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
11 Sep 184243.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
21 Dec 184647.6AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
3 Apr 188787.9DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Eleonoro Aronne (VIAF: 305358550)
Bishop Eleonoro Aronne (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerrone
Ordained BishopS. Agapit, Cathedral, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 393
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,842, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast