Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gonzaga Féchio

Bishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1965 BornMatão
14 Dec 199025.0Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jan 201145.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jan 201145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
19 Mar 201145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
6 Jan 201650.0AppointedBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 201650.2InstalledBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luis Gonzaga Féchio
Bishop Luis Gonzaga Féchio (born ) Bishop of Amparo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amparo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,968
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2016
  • i: CB, 11 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016