Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Robert Kennedy

Bishop of Armidale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1968 BornWagga Wagga
14 Aug 199931.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wagga Wagga, Australia
7 Dec 201143.6AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
9 Feb 201243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
1 Dec 201244.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
5 Jul 201446.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Robert Kennedy:
Bishop Michael Robert Kennedy (born ) Bishop of Armidale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Armidale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,254
  • ab: CB, 17 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jun 2014