Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo López Marañon, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos

Titular Bishop of Seleuciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1933BornMedina de Pomar, Spain
6 Apr 195723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
26 Jun 197036.7AppointedPrefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
2 Jul 198450.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Seleuciana
2 Jul 198450.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
8 Dec 198451.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Seleuciana
30 Oct 201077.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
7 May 201682.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo López Marañon
Bishop Gonzalo López Marañon O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2010
  • d: CB, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016