Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Wiesen, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prelate of Encarnación y Alto Paraná

Titular Bishop of Telmissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1904BornNoswendel, Germany
27 Oct 193530.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
21 Jan 195752.1AppointedPrelate of Encarnación y Alto Paraná, Paraguay
2 Feb 196459.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
19 Mar 196459.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
1 Mar 197267.2DiedPrelate of Encarnación y Alto Paraná, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Johannes Wiesen:
Bishop Johannes Wiesen S.V.D. (born , died ) Prelate of Encarnación y Alto Paraná

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015