Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Eugène de Valperga de Maglione

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1740BornValperga, Italy
17 Dec 176323.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 178039.4SelectedBishop of Nice, France
20 Mar 178039.6ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
28 Mar 178039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
15 Oct 178040.1InstalledBishop of Nice, France
Oct 1800³60.1ResignedBishop of Nice, France
20 Mar 180362.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nice, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Eugène de Valperga de Maglione
Bishop Charles-Eugène de Valperga de Maglione (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016